+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (47)
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 386 (effective 7/1/22)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386)
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022
- Signed by Speaker
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 21, 2022 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB734ER)
- Enrolled
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 22107936D-H2
- Amended by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (55-Y 39-N)
- VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 39-N)
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (25-Y 15-N)
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senators: Surovell, Bell, Stuart
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Delegates: Bell, Leftwich, Delaney
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 98-N)
- Senate substitute with amendment rejected by House 22107370D-S1 (0-Y 98-N)
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute agreed to 22107370D-S1
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB734S1
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Senator Surovell agreed to
- Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (26-Y 13-N)
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 22107370D-S1
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (9-Y 5-N 1-A)
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (54-Y 45-N)
- VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N)
On February 14, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB734H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 22106405D-H1
- Read second time
On February 13, 2022 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 22106405D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
On January 21, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100814D
+ − Impact Statements (5)
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (10)
March 12, 2022: Conference report agreed to by Senate (25-Y 15-N)
March 12, 2022: VOTE: Adoption (55-Y 39-N)
March 10, 2022: Senate insisted on substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2022: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 98-N)
March 8, 2022: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (26-Y 13-N)
March 7, 2022: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2022: VOTE: Passage (54-Y 45-N)
February 10, 2022: Reported from General Laws with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
February 8, 2022: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor