+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (7-Y 9-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Finance
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (10-Y 4-N)
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 25-N)
- Read third time and passed House (73-Y 25-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101005D
+ − Votes (5)
February 27, 2018: Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (7-Y 9-N)
February 20, 2018: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (10-Y 4-N)
February 8, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (73-Y 25-N)
February 2, 2018: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor