+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 9, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0305)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 305 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 13, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB733ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 10105658D-S1 (96-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB733S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10105658D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 10105658D-S1
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Care
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB733H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 10104996D-H1
- Read second time
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10104996D-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: #2
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103828D
+ − Votes (7)
March 3, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2010: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2010: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor