+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1026-Hugo) by voice vote
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Higher Education
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Referred from Education by voice vote
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103464D
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor