+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 18, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0091)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 91 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB732ER)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 988402350-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 988402350-H1
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 988402350-H1
- Read first time
- Reported from Finance with sub. (23-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 23, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 988369350
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (7)
February 25, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1998: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance with sub. (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor