+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0649)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 649 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB731ER)
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Engrossment reconsidered by House
- Amendments by Mr. Rust agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Printed as engrossed 989681308-EH1
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989681308-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989681308-H1
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 989681308-H1
- Reported from Finance with sub. (22-Y 1-N)
- Read first time
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 23, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 989273308
- Referred to Committee on Finance