+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 26, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0911)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 911 (effective 7/1/94)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 1994 in the House:
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (100-Y 0-N)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 20, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 12, 1994 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB731ER)
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (13-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed LD1127352 (HB731E)
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds. (21-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 3
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (9)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPT GOVERNOR'S RECOMM. (40-Y 0-N)
April 20, 1994: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1994: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1994: Reported from General Laws with amds. (21-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1994: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1994: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor