+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 11, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0444)
On April 8, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 444 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 18, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 9, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB73ER)
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Amendment by Del. Woodrum agreed to
- Communicated to Senate
- Printed as engrossed LD4033492 (HB73E)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 1-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3/4
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 12, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed