+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 10, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0357)
On April 3, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 357 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB729ER)
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2000 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (78-Y 22-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 22-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as reengrossed 005498748-E2
- Reengrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Del. Morgan agreed to
- Read second time
On February 1, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Engrossment reconsidered by House
On January 31, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 005498748-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Del. Griffith agreed to
- Read second time
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (20-Y 5-N)
On January 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 005498748