+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (7-Y 8-N)
On February 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N)
- Read third time and passed House (86-Y 13-N)
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended HB729E
- Amendment by Delegate Scott, E.T. agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 081653716-E
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 8-N)
On January 16, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil
On January 8, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081653716
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 18, 2008: Failed to report (defeated) in Courts of Justice (7-Y 8-N)
February 8, 2008: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N)
February 1, 2008: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 8-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor