+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0370)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0370)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 370 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/7/2016
On March 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB728ER)
- Enrolled
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102290D
+ − Votes (8)
February 29, 2016: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2016: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2016: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2016: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2016: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor