+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0487)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 487 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB727ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 985449376-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 985449376-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 985449376-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (23-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 23, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 986954376
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Votes (6)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor