+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in General Laws
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103532D