+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Transportation (12-Y 1-N)
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Transportation
- Rereferred from Rules (12-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended HB725E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 16101103D-E
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 1-N)
On January 15, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101103D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 2016: Passed by indefinitely in Transportation (12-Y 1-N)
February 19, 2016: Rereferred from Rules (12-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2016: Reported from Transportation with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor