+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 19, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0762)
On April 11, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 762 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 14, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB724ER)
On February 28, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Read first time
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD4725260 (HB724E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 28, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1994: Reported from Education and Health (12-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1994: Reported from Appropriations with amds. (22-Y 0-N)
January 31, 1994: Reported from Education with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor