+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 4, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0260)
On March 30, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 260 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB723ER)
On February 22, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB723H2
- Committee substitute agreed to 062874412-H2
- Read second time
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 062874412-H2
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2006 in the House:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to
- Read first time
On January 30, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 062865412-H1
On January 27, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to Courts of Justice sub-committee: Civil Law
On January 10, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 061265412
+ − Votes (6)
February 22, 2006: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2006: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor