+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 12, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0225)
On March 29, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 225 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 15, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB721ER)
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 1
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/04 046641502
+ − Votes (5)
February 24, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2004: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2004: Reported from Tra. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor