+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 19, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0555)
On April 6, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 555 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 10, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB720ER)
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 006964680-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 006964680-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 006964680-S1
- Reported from P. & E. with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
On February 3, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- Amendment by Del. Cox agreed to
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 002351200-E
On February 1, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read second time
On January 31, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 27, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (23-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 1
On January 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 002351200
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 28, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2000: Reported from P. & E. with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2000: Reported from Privileges and Elections (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor