+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 30, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0397)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 397 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB72ER)
- Enrolled
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 12100746D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB72E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Transportation
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #2
On December 21, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100746D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
February 29, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2012: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2012: Reported from Transportation with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2012: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2012: Reported from Transportation with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor