+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Motion to By for the Day agreed to (56-Y 44-N)
- VOTE: (56-Y 44-N)
- Passed by for the day
- No further action taken
- Failed to pass in House
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Sub. by Sen. Chichester agreed to (25-Y 15-N) 985458424-S1
- VOTE: FLOOR SUBSTITUTE V (25-Y 15-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Substitute by Sen. Chichester reconsidered (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Amendments #1 & 2 by Sen. Reynolds offered and withdrawn
- Sub. by Sen. Holland rejected (17-Y 23-N) 98547668-S2
- VOTE: FLOOR SUBSTITUTE V (17-Y 23-N)
- Floor substitute printed 985476681-S2 (Holland)
- Substitute by Sen. Chichester agreed to 985458424-S1
- Floor substitute printed 985458424-S1 (Chichester)
- Reading of amendments waived
- Amendments by Sen. Whipple rejected (16-Y 23-N)
- VOTE: FLOOR AMEND (16-Y 23-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - fl. sub. 985458424-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (29-Y 11-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (29-Y 11-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 989044424-E
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amd. (23-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 23, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed w/emg. clause 989044424
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: (56-Y 44-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (29-Y 11-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: FLOOR SUBSTITUTE V (25-Y 15-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: FLOOR SUBSTITUTE V (17-Y 23-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: FLOOR AMEND (16-Y 23-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (99-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1998: Reported from Finance with amd. (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor