+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 23, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0380)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 380 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB719ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103431D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 27, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2012: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2012: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (14-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2012: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor