+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 26, 2002 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2003 in Finance (13-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 9-N)
- Read third time and passed House (91-Y 9-N)
On February 9, 2002 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 024316772-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 8, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amds (16-Y 6-N)
On January 21, 2002 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 1
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 024316772