+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 23, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0952)
On April 15, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 952 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 17, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB715ER)
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (14-Y 1-N)
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2004 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 2
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/04 049463408
+ − Votes (5)
February 27, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2004: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 1-N)
January 28, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2004: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor