+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 4, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0410)
On March 31, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 410 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 18, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 13, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB713ER)
On March 4, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. (13-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On January 29, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from M. & M. R. (15-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Mining and Mineral Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 960820400
+ − Votes (7)
March 4, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1996: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 29, 1996: Reported from A. C. & N. R. (13-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 24, 1996: Reported from M. & M. R. (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor