+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 19, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0552)
On April 6, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 552 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 10, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB71ER)
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (96-Y 1-N 1-A)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 1-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate amendment agreed to by House
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from P. & E. with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2000 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 006938660-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 006938660-H1
- Read second time
On February 1, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from P. & E. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 006938660-H1
On January 25, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 2
On January 12, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/10/00 006860660
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 28, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (96-Y 1-N 1-A)
February 28, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2000: Reported from P. & E. with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
January 31, 2000: Reported from P. & E. w/substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor