+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 11, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0415)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 415 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB708ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Care
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB708H2
- Substitute by Delegate Peace agreed to 10105150D-H2
- Floor substitute printed 10105150D-H2 (Peace)
- Committee substitute rejected 10104410D-H1
- Read second time
On February 8, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2010 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 10104410D-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: #3
On January 12, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103413D
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2010: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2010: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2010: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor