+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0258)
On April 7, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 258 (effective 4/7/98)
On March 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 17, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB707ER)
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Emergency clause added
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (97-Y 2-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 2-N)
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 27, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws with amd. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 2-N)
On February 9, 1998 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 988958340-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amds. (26-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On January 23, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 988958340
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (97-Y 2-N)
February 27, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: Reported from General Laws with amd. (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
February 5, 1998: Reported from General Laws with amds. (26-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor