+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 28, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0129)
On March 17, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 129 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB707ER)
On February 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (25-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 3
On January 21, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 004574944