+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Rules (12-Y 4-N)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 32-N)
- Read third time and passed House (65-Y 32-N)
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Floor substitute printed 14104529D-H1 (Marshall, R.G.)
- Read second time
- Committee amendments rejected
- Substitute by Delegate Marshall, R.G. agreed to 14104529D-H1
- Emergency clause deleted
- Pending question ordered
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB706H1
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 7-N)
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred from Rules by voice vote
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/08/14 14102264D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 21, 2014: Passed by indefinitely in Rules (12-Y 4-N)
February 3, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (65-Y 32-N)
January 24, 2014: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (13-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsors (59)
Type:
Primary Sponsor