+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0414)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 414 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB703ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (92-Y 1-N)
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
- Passed by temporarily
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100282D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 2014: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 1-N)
February 27, 2014: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2014: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2014: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor