+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- House sustained Governor's veto
- VOTE: (43-Y 55-N)
- Motion to override Governor's veto rejected (43-Y 55-N)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB702ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 988453837-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 988453837-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 988453837-S1
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On March 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (13-Y 1-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-com: Criminal Law and Procedure
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Pursuant to S.Rule 20(j),rerefer. by R.&S.S. (13-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 983774837-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendments (23-Y 1-N)
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 23, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 983774837
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: (43-Y 55-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (13-Y 1-N)
February 20, 1998: Pursuant to S.Rule 20(j),rerefer. by R.&S.S. (13-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N)
February 13, 1998: Reported from C. J. with amendments (23-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor