+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to (51-Y 49-N)
- VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (51-Y 49-N)
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106613D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB702H1
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
- Committee substitute printed 18106613D-H1
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101023D
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
+ − Votes (4)
February 12, 2018: VOTE: AGREE TO MOTION (51-Y 49-N)
February 6, 2018: Reported from General Laws with substitute (16-Y 6-N)
February 1, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
February 1, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor