+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 5, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0061)
On March 4, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 61 (effective 7/1/96)
On February 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 19, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB701ER)
On February 16, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (13-Y 1-N 1-A)
On January 31, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 964341805
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 1-N)
February 15, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1996: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 1-N 1-A)
January 30, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 25, 1996: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor