+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0078)
On March 10, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 78 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 22, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB701ER)
On February 18, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (13-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed