+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 18, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 89 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 27, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB700ER)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 2-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 1-N)
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (81-Y 16-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (81-Y 16-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 980835144-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Mr. Callahan agreed to
- Read second time
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Title replaced
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from C. I. B. w/amds. (25-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. I. B. sub-committee: 2
On January 23, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed 980835144