+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 4, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0406)
On March 31, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 406 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 18, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB696ER)
On February 26, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Health Professions
On February 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Read first time
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 9, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 1
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed 964857813
+ − Votes (5)
February 26, 1996: VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1996: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1996: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1996: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1996: Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor