+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Finance (4-Y 10-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB695H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 082562416-H1
- Read second time
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 082562416-H1
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (24-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement (Jones, S.C.)
On January 8, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084160416