+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 3, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0388)
On April 1, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 388 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 12, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB692ER)
On February 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2002 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2002 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 022264948-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 24, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/09/02 022264948