+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 21, 2004 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0798)
On April 14, 2004 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 798 (effective 7/1/04)
On March 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 23, 2004 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB686ER)
On March 9, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 3-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 2-N)
On March 8, 2004 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 14, 2004 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB686H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 049577480-H1
- Read second time
On February 12, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 2004 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 049577480-H1
On February 10, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from C. & L. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/13/04 040442104
+ − Votes (7)
March 9, 2004: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (37-Y 3-N)
March 9, 2004: VOTE: RECONSIDER (40-Y 0-N)
March 9, 2004: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 2-N)
March 8, 2004: Reported from Commerce and Labor (12-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2004: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2004: Reported from C. & L. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor