+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- No further action taken
- Failed to pass
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Passed by for the day
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB685E
- Printed as engrossed 18100586D-E
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Higher Education
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Science and Technology with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100586D
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology