+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in A.C.& N.R. (6-Y 8-N 1-A)
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to A. C. & N. R. sub-committee: HB1207 & HB684
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (50-Y 47-N)
- Passed House (50-Y 47-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- VOTE: PASSAGE (50-Y 45-N)
- Read third time and passed House (50-Y 45-N)
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 986952132-E
- Amendment by Mr. Bloxom agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Ches. & Its Tributaries (14-Y 3-N)
On January 28, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Chesapeake and Its Tributaries
- Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed 986952132