+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 by voice vote
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (12-Y 9-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N)
On January 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101965D
+ − Votes (2)
February 2, 2018: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (12-Y 9-N)
February 1, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor