+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 27, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0611)
On April 15, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 611 (effective 1/1/99)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 20, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB681ER)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Ed. & Health sub-committee: Health Care
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Constitutional reading dispensed (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
- Passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Printed as engrossed 989000661-E
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amd. (29-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 989000661
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: CONSTITUTIONAL READING (99-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with amd. (29-Y 0-N)
January 29, 1998: Reported from H. W. I. w/amendment (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor