+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Continued to 1999 in Finance by voice vote
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (93-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 3-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Motion for pending question agreed to
- Pending question ordered
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 985974172-E
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amds. (20-Y 4-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 985974172
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 20, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 3-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from Finance with amds. (20-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor