+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0280)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 280 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB680ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Rules
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N)
- Read third time and passed House (93-Y 5-N)
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 14101071D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB680E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Rules with amendment (14-Y 1-N)
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Rules
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101071D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 5-N)
January 31, 2014: Reported from Rules with amendment (14-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor