+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 14, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0727)
On March 27, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 727 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB679ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (87-Y 5-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (87-Y 5-N)
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N)
- Read third time and passed House (90-Y 8-N)
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 082055552-EH1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB679EH1
- Amendments by Delegate Hull agreed to
- Read second time
On February 8, 2008 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 7, 2008 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 2008 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 5, 2008 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute agreed to 082055552-H1
- Read second time
On February 4, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2008 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 082055552-H1
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2008 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 087042324
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (8)
March 5, 2008: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (87-Y 5-N)
March 3, 2008: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2008: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2008: Reported from Local Government with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2008: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N)
February 1, 2008: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor