+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Left in Education and Health
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (70-Y 30-N)
- Read third time and passed House (70-Y 30-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB676H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 18106363D-H1
- Read second time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 18106363D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (9-Y 1-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101906D