+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N)
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 20-N)
- Read third time and passed House (75-Y 20-N)
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 2-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
On January 10, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee
On January 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102203D
+ − Votes (4)
February 18, 2014: Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N)
February 5, 2014: VOTE: PASSAGE (75-Y 20-N)
January 31, 2014: Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 2-N)
January 30, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor