+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Left in Judiciary
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed to LIS only 20108644D-S1
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on the Judiciary
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 20107948D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB673H1
On February 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 20107948D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 6, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101936D
+ − Impact Statements (4)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 24, 2020: Continued to 2021 in Judiciary (15-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2020: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2020: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Michael P. Mullin
Type:
Primary Sponsor