+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments
- Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (8-Y 6-N)
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rereferred from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 6-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 4-N)
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred from Transportation by voice vote
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102021D
- Referred to Committee on Transportation